Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Sydnor, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, Barron, Bromwell, Brooks, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Gutierrez, Hayes, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kipke, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified health care provider to provide a victim of sexual assault with written information describing the laws and policies governing the testing, preservation, and disposal of a sexual assault evidence collection kit; requiring a hospital or child advocacy center to transfer a sexual assault evidence collection kit to a law enforcement agency within 30 days of the exam; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from destroying or disposing of specified evidence of sexual assault within 20 years of its collection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0349
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882716/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {882716/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:31 AM