Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Ebersole, Feldmark, Korman, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $100,000 for grants to certain nonprofit organizations and area agencies on aging to expand and establish aging-in-place programs for seniors; requiring at least 20% of the appropriated funding be used to support senior villages, local, member-driven, nonprofit organizations that support community members who choose to age in place; and altering the definition of "aging-in-place program" to include community participation.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0498 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 4:43 PM