Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Chang, Glenn, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt rules and regulations for licensees of the Developmental Disabilities Administration to obtain and provide information on employees; requiring the rules and regulations to require a licensee to carry out specified duties; requiring a licensee to respond in a specified manner to a request for information; requiring a licensee to have specified immunities under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-901, 7-911 through 7-913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM