Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, D. Barnes, Cain, Ebersole, Guyton, Ivey, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Smith, Walker, Washington, and Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Human Services, to develop guidelines on a trauma-informed approach; defining "trauma-informed approach" as a method for understanding and responding to an individual with symptoms of chronic interpersonal trauma or traumatic stress; and requiring the State Department of Education to distribute certain guidelines to each local school system and publish certain guidelines on the Department's website.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0223
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {595668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {595668/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed Approach
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-427.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM