Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a credit against the county property tax for owner-occupied residential real property within a specified proximity to a specified refuse disposal system; prohibiting the governing body of Baltimore County from granting a credit for taxable years beginning after a specified date; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0702
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1247 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905264/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {905264/1 Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM