Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsored by
Delegate W. Fisher
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain circumstances under which an individual who has been convicted of a crime is not qualified for jury service; and repealing a provision specifying that an individual is not qualified for jury service if the individual has a certain charge pending for a certain crime.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/17/2021 1:03 PM