Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Angel, Knotts, Krimm, and Tarlau
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public service company that intends to terminate, because of nonpayment, electric or gas service to a specified customer to notify the property owner or manager before terminating service if the public service company has received a specified customer's consent; authorizing a specified property owner or manager to require, as a term of a specified lease, a specified tenant to assure that a specified customer provides consent for the property owner or manager to receive a specified notice of termination of services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183294/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {427877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {183294/1 Adopted 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 27
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Finance 26
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {427877/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM