Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Battery-Charged Fence Security Systems - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegate T. Branch
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to require that certain persons who provide battery-charged fence security systems comply with certain laws, require certain persons who operate or install certain security systems to obtain certain registrations or permits, require a certain installer to submit a certain affidavit, and conduct a certain inspection; authorizing a local government to issue a citation under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2020
Legislative Date
10/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2020 10/20/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation - Battery-Charged Fence Security Systems - Regulation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 1:25 PM