Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Faked Controlled Dangerous Substance - Substantially Similar Chemical Structure
Sponsored by
Delegates Haddaway-Riccio, Conway, Eckardt, Hershey, Hogan, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, Otto, Rudolph, Schuh, Schulz, and Vitale
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court, in determining if a person has violated the prohibition against distributing, attempting to distribute, or possessing with intent to distribute a specified noncontrolled substance, to consider whether the chemical structure of the noncontrolled substance is substantially similar to the chemical structure of a controlled dangerous substance.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {313126/2
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (39-97)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted 30
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {313126/2 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (39-97) 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 33
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-617 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM