Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection
Sponsored by
Delegates Beitzel, Glass, Jacobs, Weir, K. Kelly, McDonough, and Smigiel
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from restricting specified licensed bow hunters from openly carrying a handgun under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0231
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0584 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {442114/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-13)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments {442114/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-13) 70
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM