Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Angel, Atterbeary, Dumais, Kelly, McComas, and Rey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the circumstances under which a court is required to issue a permanent final protective order to include the conviction of an individual for conspiracy or solicitation to commit murder under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM