Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is deemed to be a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for specified communications; providing for the prospective application of the Act to causes of action arising on or after October 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562913/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {562913/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM