Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Student Loan Debt
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified income of specified individuals from the discharge of student loan debt under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to submit specified documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0630
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0087 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM