Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Elementary School Students - Daily Physical Activity PG 503-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a student in a Prince George's County public elementary school be provided a daily program of physical activity each week totaling 150 minutes, including a minimum of 90 minutes of physical education; requiring the program of physical activity for a certain category of student to be consistent with the student's Individualized Education Program, if applicable; requiring a Prince George's County public elementary school to designate a physical activity leadership team to plan and coordinate opportunities for certain activities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0196 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Elementary School Students - Daily Physical Activity PG 503-20
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-409.1 )
Last Updated: 2/7/2020 2:55 PM