Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Jalisi, Platt, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a registry that includes information about any employee of a health care facility whose employment was terminated because the employee was convicted of a specified crime; requiring a health care facility to submit the names of specified former employees to the Secretary for inclusion in the registry; authorizing a health care facility to access the registry under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-347.1, 19-351 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM