Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Dumais, and Morales
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over a child at least 14 years old alleged to have done specified acts and over a child at least 16 years old alleged to have committed specified crimes.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/26/2016 Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM