Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the crime of adultery.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-49)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (87-49) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page