Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Luedtke, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting from the personal property tax persons with personal property assessed at $2,500 or less; exempting persons who qualify for the personal property tax exemption under the Act from a specified fee for filing a specified annual report; requiring a person to apply annually to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for the personal property tax exemption under the Act; applying the Act to the taxable year beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 7-245 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM