Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Requirements for Controlled Access
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Clippinger, Cullison, A. Kelly, S. Robinson, Summers, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a new school or a renovated school that receives State public school construction funds, including Aging Schools Program funds and Qualified Zone Academy Bonds, to be constructed or renovated to have controlled access to allow visitors to enter the school; providing for the application of the Act to the construction or the renovation of schools that are approved by the Interagency Committee on School Construction on or after July 1, 2013; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145564/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {145564/2 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/02/2013 4/01/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM