Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City to implement the Program; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the distribution of up to $400,000 from certain abandoned property funds to the Fund for each of fiscal years 2023 through 2026; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1534 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/15/2020
Legislative Date
7/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 7/15/2020 7/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 10:34 AM