Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services - Code Revision)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a new article to the Annotated Code, to be designated and known as the "General Provisions Article", to revise, restate, and recodify the laws of the State relating to rules of interpretation, the form and administration of official oaths, the Open Meetings Act, the Public Information Act, the Maryland Public Ethics Law, acquisition of land by the United States and jurisdiction of the State and United States over specified land, and the State seal, flag, emblems, designations, and commemorative days and months; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1, 2, 20 through 34, 2A, 3, 35 through 37, 4, 5 through 18 )
(   1-101 through 1-117, 1-201 through 1-210, 1-301 through 1-303, 1-401 through 1-403, 2-101 through 2-103, 2-201 through 2-206, 2-301, 2-302, 3-101 through 3-105, 3-201 through 3-213, 3-301 through 3-306, 3-401, 3-402, 3-501, 4-101 through 4-103, 4-201 through 4-206, 4-301, 4-304 through 4-325, 4-328 through 4-340, 4-343 through 4-355, 4-358, 4-361, 4-362, 4-401 through 4-403, 4-501, 4-502, 4-601, 5-1001, 5-101 through 5-105, 5-201 through 5-210, 5-301 through 5-304, 5-401 through 5-409, 5-501 through 5-508, 5-511 through 5-522, 5-525, 5-601 through 5-611, 5-701 through 5-716, 5-801, 5-804 through 5-812, 5-815 through 5-819, 5-822 through 5-830, 5-833 through 5-839, 5-842 through 5-845, 5-848, 5-849, 5-852, 5-857 through 5-862, 5-901 through 5-904, 6-101 through 6-104, 6-201 through 6-203, 6-301, 6-302, 7-101 through 7-104, 7-201 through 7-206, 7-301 through 7-310, 7-313 through 7-319, 7-322 through 7-324, 7-327 through 7-329, 7-401 through 7-412, 7-501 through 7-505 )
(   10-501, 10-502, 10-502.1, 10-502.2, 10-502.3, 10-502.4, 10-502.5, 10-502.6, 10-502.7, 10-503 through 10-507, 10-507.1, 10-508 through 10-512, 10-601, 10-602, 10-611 through 10-628, 10-630, 13-101 through 13-105, 13-201 through 13-206, 13-301 through 13-321, 13-401 through 13-412, 13-501 through 13-505, 14-101 through 14-105, 14-201, 14-202, 15-1001, 15-101 through 15-105, 15-201 through 15-210, 15-301 through 15-304, 15-401 through 15-409, 15-501 through 15-508, 15-510 through 15-521, 15-523, 15-601 through 15-611, 15-701 through 15-715, 15-801 through 15-808, 15-811 through 15-815, 15-818 through 15-826, 15-829 through 15-835, 15-838 through 15-841, 15-844, 15-845, 15-848 through 15-850, 15-853 through 15-858, 15-901 through 15-904, 16-101 through 16-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM