Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship Month
Sponsored by
Delegates Carozza, Anderton, Barkley, Barron, Bromwell, Folden, Ghrist, Hill, Jackson, Kaiser, Kipke, Krebs, Morgan, Otto, Vogt, Walker, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim February as Maryland Sportsmanship Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge the Department of Natural Resources and specified local departments to observe Maryland Sportsmanship Month with specified activities.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0594
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM