Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits and Winery Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Cassilly, Impallaria, McComas, McDonough, Reilly, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding the Harford County Farm Fair to the list of off-site events for which a holder of a brewing company off-site permit or a winery off-site permit may use the permit; and altering the time period within which a holder of a brewing company off-site permit is required to notify the Comptroller of an intention to attend an off-site event.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0780 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653591/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits and Winery Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {653591/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits and Winery Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits and Winery Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm Fair
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-130, 2-133 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM