Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Bobo, Clippinger, Cluster, Cullison, DeBoy, Frank, Kach, Malone, and Simmons
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the contents of a renewal application for a continuing care retirement community by requiring that actuarial studies reviewed by qualified actuaries be submitted at least every 3 years and 5 years for specified continuing care agreements; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-401, 10-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM