Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that certain provisions of law do not preclude a member of the General Assembly from acquiring certain information for certain purposes; prohibiting a definition of "sociological information" adopted in rules or regulations by an official custodian for certain purposes from including a certain notice, or a list of the recipients of a certain notice; requiring a custodian to deny inspection under the Public Information Act of only a certain part of a certain distribution list, rather than the full distribution list; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 2:40 PM