Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability Companies
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property owned or leased by a benefit corporation or benefit limited liability company, property that is not used for residential purposes, and property used in a trade or business by a benefit corporation or benefit limited liability company; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0047
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0879 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {245768/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {245768/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM