Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bobo, Cane, Carr, Carter, Costa, Cullison, Frank, George, Gutierrez, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Love, Luedtke, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Tarrant, Vaughn, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene (DHMH) to establish a specified Prison In-Reach Program; requiring each county board of education to include behavioral health services with school health services; requiring DHMH to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2014 on a plan for statewide implementation of the School Health Program; requiring the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration to implement a specified program throughout the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-401, 7-415 )
(   10-1204, 10-1205, 10-1404, 10-1501, 10-1601 through 10-1605, 10-207, 10-906, 10-907, 15-103, 8-1101 )
(   2002, 2005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM