Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a prohibition, in Anne Arundel County, on a person standing in a certain highway to solicit money or donations; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in the county to enact a permit program to allow individuals of at least 18 years of age to stand in a roadway, a median divider, or an intersection to solicit money or donations from the occupant of a vehicle; requiring a plan for safely soliciting money in a roadway to include training in traffic safety; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0102 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-11)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {920712/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (127-11) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM