Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, Bobo, Carr, Clippinger, Conaway, Frush, Healey, Luedtke, McIntosh, Niemann, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing a secured party or any other party in interest to file a motion for a deficiency judgment under specified circumstances; requiring a specified motion for deficiency judgment to be filed within 3 years after the final ratification of the auditor's report; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0708
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {150314/5 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-31)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178779/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Delegates Niemann, Norman, and Beidle
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senators Raskin, Muse, and Jacobs
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {150314/5 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (104-31) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {178779/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 56
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Delegates Niemann, Norman, and Beidle 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senators Raskin, Muse, and Jacobs 59
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (102-33) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM