Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Bagnall, Brooks, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Jones, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Moon, Stewart, Carr, Shetty, and Solomon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after December 31, 2020, the use of chlorpyrifos in the State, including insecticides containing chlorpyrifos and seeds treated with chlorpyrifos; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to grant a waiver, under certain circumstances, to allow a person to use chlorpyrifos on or before December 31, 2022; and requiring the Department, with existing budgeted resources, to provide to farmers, certified crop advisors, and pesticide applicators certain education and assistance relating to integrated pest management.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930814/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {203925/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (44-89)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {233529/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-92)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {463622/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-44)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {930814/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Floor Amendment {203925/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (44-89) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Floor Amendment {233529/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-92) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Floor Amendment {463622/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (90-44) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
(   5-210.6 )
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM
Click to return on the top page