Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estate Tax - Qualified Family-Owned Business Interests - Exclusion
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, Arentz, Bates, Frank, Glass, McComas, Norman, Parrott, Schuh, and Schulz
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the determination of the Maryland estate tax under specified circumstances to exclude from the value of the gross estate $5,000,000 of the value of specified qualified family-owned business interests; providing that the Maryland estate tax imposed may not exceed a specified amount under specified circumstances; providing for the recapture of specified Maryland estate tax under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-309, 7-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page