Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland-National Capital Park Police and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Force PG/MC 105-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland-National Capital Park Police or the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Force and reside in a political subdivision that lies wholly or partially within certain districts and in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland-National Capital Park Police and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Force PG/MC 105-20
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/7/2020 2:55 PM