Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County Laws
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Fennell, Sanchez, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified municipal enforcement officer to serve a citation on behalf of a specified county on a person who the enforcement officer believes is violating or has violated a specified county law, ordinance, or resolution within the municipality or up to one-half mile outside the municipal limits; providing for the manner of service and the contents of the citation; requiring the enforcement officer to retain a copy of the citation and immediately provide a copy of the citation to the governing body of the county; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM