Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Atterbeary, Proctor, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under certain circumstances or to possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under certain circumstances; requiring certain offenders to be issued a citation under certain circumstances; providing a certain maximum fine; altering the penalty for certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Text - First - Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-321, 6-322 )
(   10-119, 12-102, 12-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM