Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified municipal corporations to establish, by local law, a specified contracting authority for the purpose of designating a community revitalization and improvement zone for construction of specified facilities; establishing an application process within the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce for designating a zone; authorizing a municipal corporation to issue specified bonds for the benefit of specified zones; requiring the transfer, from the General Fund, of specified increased tax revenue; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-601 through 12-612 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM