Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an employee organization certified as exclusive representative to disclose to certain employees all offers regarding wages made by the Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County during certain negotiations; authorizing the parties to use a certain mediator-arbitrator panel in a collective bargaining impasse; requiring the mediator-arbitrator panel to first consider and give the highest priority to the ability of the Montgomery Commission to pay for certain expenses under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {824465/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration for Wages MC 14–18
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {624162/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Substitute Committee Amendment {824465/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-308.1, 16-310, 16-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM