Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap Metal
Sponsored by
Delegates Schuh, Dwyer, and Kipke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a junk dealer or scrap metal processor who is a resident of the State to hold in a specified county a purchase of junk or scrap metal for 3 business days after the purchase; and requiring a junk dealer or scrap metal processor to hold a purchase of junk or scrap metal and a record of the purchase at a specified business address.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0725
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM