Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers or their insurers, except under specified circumstances, from being required to pay under workers' compensation law for a controlled dangerous substance that is prescribed by a physician for covered employees who have suffered accidental personal injuries, compensable hernias, or occupational diseases; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0217
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
House 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/14/2014 2/18/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-660, 9-660.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM