Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "net estate", for purposes of provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a specified share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will, to include property of a revocable trust of the decedent; requiring that the share of a surviving spouse who makes the election be paid from the decedent's estate and each revocable trust of the decedent in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786981/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {786981/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14.5-604, 3-203, 3-205, 3-206, 3-207, 3-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM