Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Cluster, Holmes, Kipke, Metzgar, Rey, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for the Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program to include veterans and members of the armed forces who have served or are currently serving on active duty for a minimum period of time; altering the eligibility requirements for the Program to include children and spouses of veterans and members of the armed forces who have served or are currently serving on active duty for a minimum period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.7, 18-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM