Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, Hill, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring county boards to require public high schools to offer at least one high-quality computer science course beginning in the 2021-2022 school year; establishing the Maryland Center for Computing Education to identify ways to expand access to high-quality computer science education, strengthen the skills of educators, and increase the number of computer science teachers; requiring the Center to work with certain institutions of higher education; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285465/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington and Afzali)
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington and Afzali)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {884035/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {285465/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {884035/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington and Afzali) 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington and Afzali) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Committee Amendment {884035/1 Withdrawn 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text - Chapter - Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)
(   12-118, 4-111.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page