Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the crime of adultery.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0267 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-35)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Crimes - Adultery - Repeal
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-35) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM