Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Dumais, Anderson, Moon, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award to a prevailing plaintiff reasonable attorney's fees and expenses in specified actions seeking to remedy a violation of a Maryland constitutional right; authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and expenses to a prevailing defendant under specified circumstances; establishing that specified limits on attorney's fees under the Maryland Tort Claims Act do not apply to a specified award of attorney's fees and expenses; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0319
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {992613/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Vogt) Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-50)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {992613/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Special Order until 3/19 (Delegate Vogt) Adopted 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (87-50) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM