Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegates Eckardt, Afzali, Arentz, Cane, Conway, Haddaway-Riccio, Jacobs, Krebs, McDermott, Otto, and Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to conduct a study of efforts to manage and reduce phosphorus pollution from agricultural sources in the State; requiring the study to include specified information and an economic impact analysis estimating specified costs and economic benefits of the Phosphorus Management Tool to a specified person; prohibiting the Department from implementing specified regulations until after the adjournment of the 2015 regular legislative session of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0963
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM