Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Buckel, Jalisi, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting under specified circumstances a landlord from renting a unit to an individual convicted of a crime of violence or allowing an individual convicted of a crime of violence to reside in a unit in a senior apartment facility on the same floor on which a vulnerable adult resides; providing for enforcement by the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM