Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Use of Handgun in Crime of Violence or Felony - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Arora, Clippinger, Howard, Rosenberg, Swain, and Valderrama
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the statute of limitations for a violation of a specified provision of law prohibiting using a firearm in the commission of a crime of violence or felony; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0575 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {642310/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/20/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {642310/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM