Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Identity Theft
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson and Jalisi
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a person who was convicted of a crime to file a petition for expungement if the person has an identity theft passport indicating that the crime was actually committed by another using the person's personal identifying information; and authorizing a court to grant a petition for expungement at any time if the person presents an identity theft passport under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM