Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Anderson, Angel, Beidle, Carr, Chang, Conaway, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Kelly, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring county boards of education, beginning in the 2019-2020 school year, to report information on the provision of specialized intervention services to the State Department of Education and the General Assembly by July 30 each year; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with county boards, representatives of advocacy groups, parents, and educators, to establish specified guidelines; requiring county boards and the Department to publish annually specified information on their Web sites; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {715864/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-20)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {715864/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Text - Third - Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (119-20) 64
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-111.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM