Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $114,500 to $124,500 the limit on the maximum salary that the Board of Public Works may set for a clerk of a circuit court; and applying the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0668
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing canceled
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-41) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Text - Chapter - Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM