Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Bagnall, Brooks, Cardin, Charkoudian, Ebersole, Hettleman, Jones, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Sample-Hughes, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, Smith, Guyton, Wilkins, Patterson, Kaiser, Washington, Mosby, Turner, Ivey, Feldmark, D. Barnes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to appear, on election day, at a precinct polling place in the individual's county of residence and apply to register to vote; requiring an applicant for voter registration on election day to provide certain proof of residency; requiring the State Board of Elections to take appropriate measures to notify potential registrants of the correct precinct polling place for the potential registrants' residence addresses under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {575266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {575266/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-41) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {544135/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Text - Chapter - Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places
(   3-302, 3-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page